OR SB931 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that court has discretion over selection of alternate jurors and when alternate jurors are informed of alternate status. Authorizes court, with prior agreement of parties, to replace discharged juror with alternate juror in either guilt or sentencing phase of criminal case after jury begins deliberations.
Title
Relating to alternate jurors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 359, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Huffman, Stark, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Monroe. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |