OR SB93 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Converts Child-Caring Agencies Fund into account in General Fund of State Treasury. Converts Child-Caring Agencies Fund into account in General Fund of State Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Child-Caring Agencies Account.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-15SenateChapter 193, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-08SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-01HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-27SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-25HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-03-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-04SenateVote explanation filed by Heard.
2021-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Wagner.
2021-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback