OR SB93 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Converts Child-Caring Agencies Fund into account in General Fund of State Treasury. Converts Child-Caring Agencies Fund into account in General Fund of State Treasury.
Title
Relating to Child-Caring Agencies Account.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 193, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-03-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Heard. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Wagner. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |