OR SB927 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local governments to develop historic resource program to designate resources for protection. Removes requirement for owner consent to designate resources. Establishes minimum components for program. Requires additional action by local government to designate resources designated on National Register of Historic Places on or after effective date of Act. Requires that existing protections be maintained. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Land Conservation and Development Commission to provide grants or technical assistance to local governments in developing and implementing program.
Title
Relating to historic preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and referral to Rules and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |