OR SB919 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes city or county to adopt five-year property tax exemption for newly constructed accessory dwelling unit, or newly converted duplex, triplex or quadplex, that is used as occupant's primary residence. Provides] Authorizes city or county to adopt five-year property tax exemption for newly constructed accessory dwelling unit, or newly converted duplex, triplex or quadplex, that is used as occupant's primary residence. Requires approval of affected taxing districts imposing majority of total combined rate of taxation on eligible property. Applies to property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15SenateEffective date, September 24, 2023.
2023-08-15SenateChapter 583, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-31SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-23HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 10--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Goodwin, Lewis, McIntire, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 7--Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Ruiz, Wright.
2023-06-23HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-22HouseWork Session held.
2023-06-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Revenue.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-20SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.)
2023-06-06SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-31SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President.
2023-03-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-27SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-20SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB919
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB919/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23308
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23659
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23603
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25261
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76572
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77296
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74182
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76776
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76783
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266460
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265762
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267305
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267306
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271707
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272038
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275615
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275618
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275671
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80297
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80298
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80349
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80350
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80649
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276327
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276328
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276330
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276355
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80991
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276398
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276399
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276418
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34810
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36012
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587360
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36318
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589669

Bill Comments

feedback