OR SB913 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes technical changes to paid family and medical leave insurance program. Makes technical changes to paid family and medical leave insurance program. Provides circumstances under which Director of the Employment Department may dismiss request for hearing. Specifies circumstances under which requests for hearing to review final decisions of director may occur. Sets maximum wages that are subject to contribution rate for purposes of contributions due on or after January 1, 2024, at amount that is equivalent to Social Security contribution and benefit base limit established by federal Social Security Administration. Requires Director of the Employment Department to annually adjust maximum wage cap to align with Social Security contribution and benefit base limit. Authorizes director to disclose confidential information relating to paid family and medical leave program under certain circumstances. Clarifies Employment Department's rulemaking authority regarding dispute resolution process for equivalent employer plans. Excludes certain information related to final orders of department from requirement that information be maintained in digital format. Modifies definition of "employee" to exclude certain elected officials and holders of public office. Clarifies that definition of "wages" does not mean employee contributions paid by employer. Clarifies determination criteria for employee's place of performance for purposes of determining whether employee's wages are subject to provisions related to contributions and benefits. Permits employer to allow employee to use all or portion of other paid leave to supplement paid family and medical leave benefits. Clarifies that chapter relating to family and medical leave insurance benefits and contributions is not tax law subject to jurisdiction of tax court. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the family and medical leave insurance program; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-21SenateEffective date, September 24, 2023.
2023-07-21SenateChapter 292, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-13SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-20SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-15SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Hansell.
2023-06-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 22; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Girod.
2023-05-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 15--Boice, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Conrad, Kropf, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-01HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-04-26HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-03-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-03-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-03-23SenateCarried over to 03-27 by unanimous consent.
2023-03-22SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB913
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB913/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22933
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23054
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23143
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24613
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75681
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76197
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74165
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75686
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76066
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267162
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263908
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265267
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268847
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265086
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270533
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270553
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271374
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271579
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271770
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271780
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78802
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78821
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78824
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78845
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34614
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=567455
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35439
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=578234
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586435

Bill Comments

feedback