OR SB912 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Director of Employment Department to deduct amount from future weekly family and medical leave insurance benefits for overpayments due to individual's fault. Authorizes Director of Employment Department to deduct amount from future weekly family and medical leave insurance benefits for overpayments due to individual's fault. Authorizes director to deduct amount from future weekly benefits for overpayments not due to individual's fault. Limits collection period to five years following week in which erroneous payment finally established, except in case of fraud. Specifies contents of notices of recovery. Authorizes director to waive recovery of overpaid benefits, except in case of fraud. Requires director to establish process by which covered individual may request hearing to obtain review of final determination of director regarding benefit deductions. Provides that person is ineligible for benefits after person is convicted of fraud. Authorizes director to cancel unrecoverable benefits paid as overpayments under certain circumstances. Authorizes director to request offset of moneys owed to debtor by state against certain benefit overpayments.] Authorizes director to pay fee charged by Department of Revenue for processing request to offset against liquidated state debt state tax refund owed to debtor. Authorizes director to collect employer assistance grant repayments and contributions from self-employed individuals and tribal governments, including penalties and interest. Allows director to attach liens on real or personal property as result of failure to remit such repayments and contributions. Authorizes director to assess penalties against employer that violates requirements applicable to employer-offered family and medical leave benefit plans. Requires director to establish process by which employer may request hearing to obtain review of penalty assessments. Provides when director's decision to assess penalty becomes final. Authorizes director to waive, reduce or compromise outstanding nonpayment contribution balances of $10 or less. Authorizes director to retain overpayments of mandatory contributions for overpayments that do not exceed $10. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the family and medical leave insurance program; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2023-05-26SenateChapter 120, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-19SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-01HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-04-26HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-03-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-03-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-03-22SenateCarried over to 03-23 by unanimous consent.
2023-03-21SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB912
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB912/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB912/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB912/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB912/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22932
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23053
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75680
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76046
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74170
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75685
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75920
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267163
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263903
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268838
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264632
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270532
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270552
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270604
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271358
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78804
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34613
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=566233
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35438
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=578220

Bill Comments

feedback