OR SB910 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail or hospital pharmacy to provide written notice in conspicuous manner of availability of naloxone at pharmacy. Allows pharmacist, upon being presented with prescription for opiate or opioid of specified strength, to offer to prescribe and provide naloxone kit. Removes requirement for written approval by parole or probation officer for administration of synthetic opiate as treatment for opiate addiction if requirements of statute are met. Allows county or local public health authority to waive siting restrictions on methadone clinics to extent necessary to remove unreasonable barriers to patients' access to treatment. Requires monitoring of naloxone equivalents by prescription drug monitoring program.] Permits Oregon Health Authority to identify by rule other drugs that are subject to monitoring under prescription drug monitoring program. Removes requirement for pharmacy to report name, address, phone number, date of birth and sex of patient for whom naloxone was prescribed. Allows pharmacy, health care professional or pharmacist to distribute multiple naloxone kits to social service agencies or other persons who work with individuals who have experienced opiate overdose and allows subsequent distribution to individual likely to experience opiate overdose or family member of individual. Permits Oregon Health Authority to review prescription monitoring information of individual who dies from drug overdose. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to drug treatment; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 470, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Thomsen. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--President Courtney. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |