OR SB909 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Updates and modernizes laws that govern formation, governance, operations and conversion of limited liability companies in this state and relations among members, managers and third parties with respect to limited liability companies in this state. Updates and modernizes laws that govern formation, governance, operations and conversion of limited liability companies in this state and relations among members, managers and third parties with respect to limited liability companies in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limited liability companies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-02-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB909
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB909/Introduced
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23359
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24365
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24409
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74147
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266946
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266721
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269212

Bill Comments

feedback