OR SB901 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes translator district board to establish property tax permanent rate limit and impose operating taxes, following elector approval. Authorizes district board to impose local option taxes following elector approval. Authorizes translator districts to enter into enforcement agreements with cities to permit code enforcement officers to determine if property occupant is intentionally receiving and using translator district signals.
Title
Relating to translator districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |