OR SB90 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from public disclosure addresses of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities residing in adult foster homes, residential training facilities or residential training homes, unless public interest requires disclosure in particular instance. Exempts from public disclosure addresses of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities residing in adult foster homes, residential training facilities or residential training homes, unless public interest requires disclosure in particular instance. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public disclosure; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-08SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Thatcher.
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-23SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback