OR SB90 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from public disclosure addresses of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities residing in adult foster homes, residential training facilities or residential training homes, unless public interest requires disclosure in particular instance. Exempts from public disclosure addresses of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities residing in adult foster homes, residential training facilities or residential training homes, unless public interest requires disclosure in particular instance. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public disclosure; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 318, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |