OR SB898 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school districts from receiving State School Fund distributions for certain students who have satisfied requirements for high school diploma and who are enrolled in one or more college-level courses. Directs Department of Education to award grants to school districts for support service programs, education innovation programs and education intervention programs.] Directs department to expend no more than specified amount for grants from State School Fund.] Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015] on passage.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 803, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Buehler. |
2015-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |