OR SB897 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds to Oregon Department of Administrative Services to distribute to State Fair Council to fund assessment of fairground facilities and deferred maintenance, improvement and enhancement of fairground facilities. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to funding for the State Fair Council; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |