OR SB891 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that court hold hearing on petition to appoint fiduciary filed by Oregon Public Guardian and Conservator or county public guardian and conservator. Requires court to appoint legal counsel for respondent in proceeding. Requires payment for appointed counsel from guardianship or conservatorship estate of respondent or at state expense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to proceedings for appointment of a fiduciary brought by a public guardian and conservator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-04SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-04-01SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback