OR SB889 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies definitions of "Class I all-terrain vehicle" and "Class IV all-terrain vehicle." Removes requirement that certain off-road vehicles be equipped with windshield wipers when vehicle is operated off highway. Modifies definition of "Class IV all-terrain vehicle.] Modifies definitions of "Class I all-terrain vehicle" and "Class IV all-terrain vehicle." Removes requirement that certain off-road vehicles be equipped with windshield wipers when vehicle is operated off highway. Requires off-road vehicles operated on highway and equipped with windshield, top edge of which is at least six inches above steering wheel, to be equipped with windshield wiper.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to off-road vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-01SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-08-01SenateChapter 372, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-18SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-23HouseThird reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 2--Cate, Nelson; Excused, 7--Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Ruiz, Wright.
2023-06-22HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-21HouseReferred to Transportation.
2023-06-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-20SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Woods. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-05-16SenateWork Session held.
2023-05-11SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-13SenateReferred to Transportation.
2023-02-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB889
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB889/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB889/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB889/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB889/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22950
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24908
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24920
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24931
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73993
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264265
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264001
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273688
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273921
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273922
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273923
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79871
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79891
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79906
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80007
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80839
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35854
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587699
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589663

Bill Comments

feedback