OR SB887 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurer, Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board to cover specified health services without prior authorization in health benefit plans and benefit plans offered by insurer or board. Prescribes minimum number of visits that must be covered. Prohibits health insurer from requesting refund of payment made on claim if treatment was approved by health insurer, and health insurer confirmed coverage of service with health care provider in writing, online or by telephone.
Title
Relating to health insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB887 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB887/Introduced |