OR SB881 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Director of Department of Revenue to reimburse worker leasing company for any employer contribution payments made by worker leasing company if Department of Revenue determines pursuant to amended combined quarterly report that refund is due. Provides that client company that is furnished workers by worker leasing company is responsible for employer duties under paid family and medical leave insurance program with respect to workers leased to client company.] Directs Director of Employment Department] Department of Revenue to reimburse worker leasing company for any employer contribution payments made by worker leasing company on behalf of client company that meets certain criteria] if Department of Revenue determines pursuant to amended combined quarterly report that refund is due. Applies to payments of contributions by worker leasing company on behalf of client employer on or after January 1, 2023 made before effective date of Act]. Provides that worker leasing company is not responsible for paying employer contribution amounts on behalf of client employers that employ fewer than 25 employees. Establishes method by which Employment Department shall determine number of employees employed by employer for purposes of determining liability for such contributions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to obligations of worker leasing companies under the paid family and medical leave insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2023-04-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Hayden declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Carried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |