OR SB88 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corrects statutory cross-references to community developmental disabilities programs. Corrects statutory cross-references to community developmental disabilities programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to community developmental disabilities programs.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-15SenateChapter 192, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-08SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-01HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-27SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Morgan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-25HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-03-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Johnson.
2021-03-10SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-10SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-09SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback