OR SB872 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires pharmaceutical manufacturers to report to Department of Consumer and Business Services total amount of money spent on patient assistance programs, information on financial assistance provided to pharmacies, government agencies and advocacy organizations and total amount of financial incentives paid to each pharmacy benefit manager. Requires pharmaceutical manufacturers to report to Department of Consumer and Business Services total cost of] amount of money spent on patient assistance programs, and] information on financial assistance provided to pharmacies, government agencies and advocacy organizations and total amount of financial incentives paid to each pharmacy benefit manager. Excludes proprietary information from disclosure on department's website.] Exempts from public disclosure information reported to department until department posts to website all information reported by manufacturer. Requires state-sponsored programs that use pharmacy benefit managers to use fee-only pharmacy benefit managers. Requires insurers to post specified information regarding formulary, tiers and costs for small employer and individual health benefit plans to insurer's website. Requires 60-day advance notice to department and to enrollees adversely affected by change in formulary. Requires insurer and allows pharmacy to notify insured that if cash] retail price for drug is less than insured's cost-share] out-of-pocket cost for drug using pharmacy benefit, insured may pay cash] retail price and expense must be counted] if requested by enrollee, insurer must count cost toward deductible or out-of-pocket maximum. Requires State Board of Pharmacy to prescribe by rule notice of enrollee's rights for distribution to pharmacy customers and to translate notice into multiple languages. Requires hospitals and other medical providers to disclose in patient billing information regarding mark-up on price of drug. Also requires billing to disclose price of drug charged to specified state agencies and insurers] report to Oregon Health Authority information regarding 50 most prescribed drugs and 50 most expensive drugs prescribed by provider. Requires specified state agencies to report to Legislative Assembly on high-cost drugs. Requires Oregon Health Authority to refer to Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee any drug exceeding specified cost. Requires patient advocacy organization with budget] annual gross receipts exceeding $50,000 that has registered lobbyist in this state to report to Oregon Government Ethics Commission and Oregon Health Authority] specified information regarding funding received from participants in pharmaceutical supply chain. Requires pharmacy benefit managers to report to Department of Consumer and Business Services and plan sponsors specified information regarding rebates, reimbursements, fees and incentives paid for drugs by manufacturers, insurers and pharmacies. Requires insurers to include with rate filing certified statement regarding insurers' use of rebates. Requires drug advertisement to disclose wholesale price of drug.] Modifies responsibilities of Task Force on Fair Pricing of Prescription Drugs and requires report of findings, by September 15, 2020, to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health. Modifies reporting to department by insurers about costly drugs reimbursed by health benefit plans. Requires pharmaceutical manufacturers that register with State Board of Pharmacy to also register with department. Requires department to adopt registration fee based on reasonable cost to department to administer specified provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the cost of prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-06-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-19SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-19SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-06-10SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-06SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-29SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback