OR SB872 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases amount of maximum total tax credits for certified film production development contributions for fiscal year. Allows for reimbursement for local media production projects from principal portion of Oregon Production Investment Fund. Limits amount of expense reimbursement from principal portion of fund for filmmakers other than local filmmakers and for local media production projects. Increases limit on reimbursement for local filmmaker or media production services company. Applies to fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2015. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to certified film production development contributions; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ginny Burdick [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] |
Sen. Diane Rosenbaum [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Tax Credits by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Tax Credits. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |