OR SB870 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts Interstate Compact for Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateEffective date, January 1, 2020.
2019-06-17SenateChapter 356, 2019 Laws.
2019-06-12SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-06SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-05HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
2019-06-05HouseThird reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
2019-06-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-03HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-04-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-09SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow, Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Burdick, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, President Courtney, Thatcher, Winters; Excused, 1--Hansell.
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-04-03SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback