OR SB87 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Housing and Development, then Tax Expenditures.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates income tax credit for lost rental income of landlord, forgone due to prohibition on evictions and rent nonpayment actions during COVID-19 emergency period. Creates income tax credit for lost rental income of landlord, forgone due to prohibition on evictions and rent nonpayment actions during COVID-19 emergency period. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tax credit for lost rental income during COVID-19 emergency period; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Tax Expenditures.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback