OR SB868 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates process for obtaining extreme risk protection order prohibiting person from possessing firearms when court finds that person presents imminent risk, or risk in foreseeable future, of suicide or causing injury to other persons. Establishes procedures for peace officer or family or household member of person to apply for order. Establishes procedures for respondent to request hearing, and for continuance of extreme risk protection order after hearing or if hearing is not requested. Establishes procedures for termination and renewal of order. Requires court to order respondent to surrender firearms, ammunition and concealed handgun license upon issuance of order. Provides for law enforcement officer serving order to request immediate surrender of firearms and to carry out lawful search and seizure of firearms. Punishes violation of order, or false application for order, by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to extreme risk protection orders; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB868 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB868/Introduced |