OR SB865 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires county or city governing body to submit notice of tentative plan to certain special districts for district approval prior to approval by governing body. Requires certain special districts to submit report detailing district boundaries, district facilities and easements and rights of way held by special district to each city and county in which any part of district is located. Requires district to notify city or county within 90 days of change to information in report.
Title
Relating to approval of plats by certain special districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 357, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |