OR SB863 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes rural fire protection district to acquire real property or easement for purpose of establishing fire evacuation route, to construct or maintain fire evacuation route or to participate in agreement related to fire evacuation route. Authorizes rural fire protection district to acquire real property or easement for purpose of establishing fire evacuation route, to construct or maintain fire evacuation route or to participate in agreement related to fire evacuation route. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to rural fire protection districts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 502, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |