OR SB86 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes licensing agency to revoke, suspend, impose conditions on or refuse to renew license to operate residential training facility or residential training home under specified conditions and to consider performance and experience of applicant or licensee in other states or jurisdictions. Authorizes licensing agency to revoke, suspend, impose conditions on or refuse to renew license to operate residential training facility or residential training home under specified conditions and to consider performance and experience of applicant or licensee in other states or jurisdictions. Requires agency to adopt rules for imposition of conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to licensing of residential facilities.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher.
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback