OR SB858 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes formation of children's service districts. Authorizes formation of children's service districts. Authorizes children's service districts to levy property taxes to fund programs that offer children's services. Defines "children's services" as services that support children's total health and well-being provided outside of school hours to individuals not more than 18 years of age. Provides that, if action is filed by taxpayer for real property located within children's service district asserting valid claim that revenue funding project is subject to compression under $5 per $1,000 of real market value cap for purposes of Ballot Measure 5 (1990) as revenue funding project constituting educational services, children's service district shall discontinue project and shall use revenue for project that does not constitute educational services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children's service districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2023-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback