OR SB856 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Office of New Americans in Governor's office. Specifies duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to services for immigrants in Oregon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback