OR SB853 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sale, purchase or use of pesticide chlorpyrifos. Requires State Department of Agriculture to place pesticide products containing neonicotinoid on list of restricted-use pesticides. Amends pesticide product registration fee provision. Reduces maximum fee for certain occupational licenses related to pesticides.
Title
Relating to pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB853 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB853/Introduced |