OR SB850 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that report of death for certain decedent who was homeless at time of death indicate that decedent's residence address was "Domicile Unknown.". Requires that report of death indicate housing status of decedent.] Requires that report of death for certain decedent who was homeless at time of death indicate that decedent's residence address was "Domicile Unknown."
Title
Relating to reports of death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 417, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |