OR SB849 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Act as Oregon First-Time Home Buyer Savings Account Act. Permits individual to create first-time home buyer savings account with financial institution to pay or reimburse qualified beneficiary's eligible costs for first-time purchase of single family residence. Requires account holder to submit to Department of Revenue information on designated forms and detailed account of first-time home buyer savings account activity. Directs department to prepare forms and distribute informational materials. Allows subtraction from account holder's federal taxable income amounts contributed to first-time home buyer savings account during each tax year. Exempts from taxation amount of interest and other income earned on account. Disallows subtraction or exemption from taxable income for person other than account holder who contributes funds to account. Provides that withdrawals for other than approved purposes are taxable income to account holder. Establishes amount and time limitations on subtractions and exemptions from taxable income. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to first-time home buyer savings accounts; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Finance and Revenue. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |