OR SB849 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to liability arising out of skiing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to skiing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB849 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB849/Introduced |