OR SB847 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates process for State Land Board, Department of State Lands and Legislative Assembly to coordinate transfer of certain trust lands managed for benefit of Common School Fund that have limited performance potential as assets of Common School Fund to certain other public bodies better positioned to manage lands for benefit of public.
Title
Relating to state trust lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Chapter 693, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 6--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Winters; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Olsen. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |