OR SB846 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Effective date, April 30, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Effective date, April 30, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies method for calculating amount transferred from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to Employer Incentive Fund. Directs State Treasurer to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to state financial administration. Requires State Treasurer to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.] Modifies method for calculating amount transferred from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to Employer Incentive Fund. Repeals transfer of moneys from certain funds and accounts to General Fund. Modifies dates for certain transfers of moneys to General Fund. Authorizes Oregon Health Authority to oversee and approve expenditures from Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund during biennium ending June 30, 2021. Modifies certain deadlines established by Drug Addiction Treatment and Recovery Act. Authorizes Department of Education to enter into agreements to disburse moneys for summer academic and enrichment opportunities. Requires transfer to General Fund of certain unexpended and uncommitted moneys appropriated for education purposes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Effective date, April 30, 2021. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Chapter 10, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 30, 2021. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 10, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Under Special Order of Business. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 6--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |