OR SB845 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies procedures required for binding arbitration for certain public employees. Modifies procedures required for binding arbitration for certain public employees. Requires arbitration to be conducted by three-person arbitration panel. Requires certain percentage of diverse arbitrators be included amongst list of potential arbitrators submitted to interested parties for consideration by Employment Relations Board. Requires parties to arbitration proceeding to submit last best offer package that includes parties' position on each unresolved subject matter item. Requires arbitration panel to select one position for each item and issue findings with respect to each finding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to binding arbitration for purposes of public employee collective bargaining.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-23SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-02-03SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB845
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB845/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73740
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76017
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266907
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266268
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266870
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267417

Bill Comments

feedback