OR SB837 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Fish Passage Restoration Subaccount within Fish Passage Fund.
Title
Relating to fish protection; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Effective date, July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Chapter 674, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Unger. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 5--Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Esquivel, McKeown, Witt. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Boquist, Close. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |