OR SB835 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies procedures for early medical release of adult in custody from prison. Modifies procedures for early medical release of adult in custody from prison. Directs Department of Corrections to inform adults in custody concerning release process and develop application form. Establishes Medical Release Advisory Committee within State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision. Specifies qualifications of members of committee. Requires board to follow release recommendation of committee unless adult in custody poses specific danger to another person or public that outweighs compassionate reasons for release. Provides that staff attorney of committee may petition court for resentencing in order to effectuate early medical release. Directs Department of Corrections to annually report data concerning medical release to committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to early medical release from prison; declaring an emergency; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |