OR SB835 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows dentist to advertise practice in specialty area of dentistry. Authorizes Oregon Board of Dentistry to adopt rules. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to advertising by dentists; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, June 13, 2019. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 379, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |