OR SB834 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to develop and present proposal for creation of human rights commission to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services and health no later than December 1, 2017. Sunsets December 31, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to basic human rights; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, June 14, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 353, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Barreto, Esquivel, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Meek. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |