OR SB830 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that, to extent provided by Oregon Liquor Control Commission rules, if wine labeled with American viticultural area in Oregon is labeled with single grape variety as type designation, wine must meet specified content requirements. Requires that, to extent provided by Oregon Liquor Control Commission rules, if wine labeled with American viticultural area in Oregon is labeled with single grape variety as type designation, wine must meet specified content requirements. Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to exempt wine varieties or American viticultural areas from requirement.] Requires commission to make requirements applicable to wine with labels identifying Willamette Valley viticultural area and American viticultural areas wholly or partly within Willamette Valley viticultural area. Creates exception. Requires commission to classify certain grape varieties as exempt from content requirements. Authorizes commission to exempt additional grape varieties by rule. Prohibits identifying Pinot noir as exempt grape variety. Establishes content requirement for wine from exempt grape varieties. Establishes default content requirement for wines not subject to other content requirements. Applies] Makes content requirements applicable to wine labeled on or after January 1, 2023. Imposes revised content requirements for wine bottled on or after January 1, 2030. Requires commission to appoint advisory committee. Sunsets advisory committee January 2, 2030] 2023. Requires commission to adopt rules establishing penalty schedule for labeling requirement. Creates exception to civil penalty. Requires adoption of initial rules in time to take effect January 1, 2023. Repeals rule adoption requirement January 2, 2023] 2024. Requires commission to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020, regarding advisory committee recommendations and status of commission rule adoption proceedings. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to wine labeling; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Golden, Heard, Linthicum. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |