OR SB83 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to youth diversion plan. Modifies provisions of law relating to youth diversion plan. Directs Oregon Youth Authority to collaborate with county juvenile departments regarding youth diversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to youth diversion.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-04SenateVote explanation filed by Heard.
2021-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Heard, Knopp; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Wagner.
2021-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback