OR SB829 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires video transmissions of executive department and legislative department to be closed-captioned for access by hearing-impaired persons. Provides exception. Applies to video transmissions created on or after January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to closed captioning of state government video transmissions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |