OR SB824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Oregon Board of Dentistry to accept results of national standardized examinations under specified circumstances when determining fitness of applicant to practice dentistry or dental hygiene. Allows Oregon Board of Dentistry to accept results of national standardized examinations under specified circumstances when determining fitness of applicant to practice dentistry or dental hygiene. Requires board to accept results from regional and national testing agencies for laboratory and clinical examinations under specified circumstances. Requires board, for certain applicants for licensure, to accept results of clinical board examinations from regional and national testing agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to dental licensure examinations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 20, 2019. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 467, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |