OR SB823 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies procedures for providing notice to defendant in charging instrument and within specified time prior to trial when conviction would result in firearm prohibition. Specifies procedures for providing notice to defendant in charging instrument and at arraignment] within specified time prior to trial when conviction would result in firearm prohibition. Specifies procedures for proving nature of relationship between defendant and alleged victim for certain crimes. Directs court to make determination concerning relationship and enter order prohibiting defendant from possessing] in judgment of conviction concerning possession of firearms. Directs court to notify Department of State Police and county sheriff concerning prohibition] order for entry into databases. Appropriates moneys to department to fund entry of order into Law Enforcement Data System. Requires law enforcement agency to directly notify restraining order petitioner, instead of Department of Justice, when respondent requests return of firearm or ammunition.
Title
Relating to firearm notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |