OR SB822 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidates unpaid child support accruing under superseded child support order into amounts payable under later-issued court order. Consolidates unpaid child support accruing under superseded child support order into amounts payable under later-issued court order.
Title
Relating to child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 415, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 3--Heard, Patterson, Thatcher. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |