OR SB820 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes exception from regulation by Sexual Offense Treatment Board for certain persons. Removes exception from regulation by Sexual Offense Treatment Board for certain persons. Appropriates moneys out of General Fund to Oregon Youth Authority for specified purposes. Becomes operative May 31, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sexual offense treatment; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |