OR SB819 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, July 13, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, July 13, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies abbreviated school day program requirements. Modifies abbreviated school day program requirements. Requires that parent or foster parent must give informed and written consent for student with disability to be placed on program. Prescribes duties of school district superintendent and Department of Education in relation to abbreviated school day programs. Directs school districts to provide notice to parents or foster parents of every student with disability who was on abbreviated school day program at end of 2022-2023 school year or who had abbreviated school days during 2022-2023 school year. Prescribes requirements of notice. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to abbreviated school day programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the C-Eng bill. (Printed D-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the C-Eng bill. (Printed D-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, July 13, 2023. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 290, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 19; Nays, 6--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Robinson, Smith DB; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2023-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 14--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Conrad, Cramer, Helfrich, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Sanchez, Scharf, Stout, Valderrama, Wallan; Excused, 8--Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Ruiz, Wright. |
2023-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed D-Engrossed. |
2023-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-06-21 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed C-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-01 | House | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. |
2023-06-01 | House | Read. |
2023-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-30 | House | Carried over to May 31, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-26 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-24 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2023-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2023-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Lieber, Robinson, Steiner, Taylor. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |