OR SB819 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes procedure by which district attorney and incarcerated person may jointly petition sentencing court for reconsideration of conviction and sentence. Establishes procedure by which district attorney and incarcerated person may jointly petition sentencing court for reconsideration of conviction and sentence. Authorizes court to, upon granting petition, resentence person on original conviction, vacate previous judgment of conviction, accept plea to new offense and impose sentence on new offense. Directs district attorney to notify victim or survivor of victim] in trauma-informed manner when petition is filed, provide victim with copy of petition and inform victim of reconsideration hearing and process. Directs court to allow victim to make statement at hearing on petition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to petitions for conviction reconsideration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-07-07SenateChapter 414, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-23SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 16--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Girod, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-07SenateWork Session not held.
2021-03-31SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB819
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB819/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB819/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB819/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB819/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32021
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=518277
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32711
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528663

Bill Comments 750

feedback