OR SB819 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies percentage of amounts school districts must pay from State School Fund to public charter schools that are not virtual public charter schools. Directs school district or sponsor to transfer federal, state and local moneys to public charter schools on same basis moneys are transferred to nonchartered public schools in school district. Considers transportation costs incurred by public charter school to be same as transportation costs incurred by school district. Directs Secretary of State to examine at least five public charter schools to identify services provided by sponsor, determine related expenses and identify and determine amount of public revenues directly or indirectly received by sponsor for public charter schools. Requires secretary to submit summary to appropriate legislative committees by January 15, 2017. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to public charter schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and be referred to Ways and Means. Subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue recinded by order of the President. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |